Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 03/22/2007
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 03/22/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 03/22/2007
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5]* 03/22/2007
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 03/22/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/22/2007
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 03/22/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 03/22/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 03/22/2007
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8]* 03/22/2007
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 03/22/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/22/2007
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large]* 03/22/2007
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31]* 03/22/2007
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 03/22/2007
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 03/22/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 03/22/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 03/22/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 03/22/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 03/22/2007
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 03/22/2007
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4]* 03/22/2007
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 03/22/2007
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23]* 03/22/2007
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 03/22/2007
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3]* 03/22/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 03/22/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 03/22/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 03/22/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 03/26/2007
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 03/26/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/28/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 03/28/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/28/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/28/2007
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 03/28/2007
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 03/29/2007
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/29/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/29/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/17/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 04/17/2007
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 04/17/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/17/2007
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 04/17/2007
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/17/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 04/18/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/18/2007
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 04/18/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/18/2007
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 04/19/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/24/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/24/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 05/01/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/01/2007
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 05/02/2007
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 05/02/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/02/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/03/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/03/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 05/03/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/10/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 05/10/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/10/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/10/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 05/10/2007
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 05/10/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/15/2007
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/15/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/15/2007
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 05/21/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/14/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 06/14/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 09/20/2007
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 12/12/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/10/2008
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 04/29/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/29/2008
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/30/2008
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 06/10/2008