Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/29/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/29/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 04/17/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 04/20/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/21/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 04/01/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/08/2008
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 04/08/2008
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 04/08/2008
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 04/17/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/11/2008