Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 04/18/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 04/19/2007
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 04/19/2007
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 04/20/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/20/2007
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 04/20/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 04/20/2007
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 04/26/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/26/2007
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 04/26/2007
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 05/03/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 05/07/2007
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 05/07/2007
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 05/14/2007
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 05/14/2007
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 05/14/2007
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 05/24/2007
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 06/07/2007
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 06/15/2007
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 06/25/2007
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 06/25/2007
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 09/05/2007
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 09/25/2007

Show cosponsors who withdrew