Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 03/22/2007
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 03/22/2007
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 03/22/2007
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 03/22/2007
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 03/27/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/28/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 05/09/2007
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 05/09/2007
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 05/09/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 05/09/2007
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 05/09/2007
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 05/21/2007
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 05/23/2007
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 06/21/2007
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 06/21/2007
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 07/10/2007
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 09/05/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 10/22/2007
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 10/29/2007
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 12/04/2007
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 02/06/2008
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 03/03/2008
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 05/22/2008
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 09/08/2008
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 09/08/2008
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 09/16/2008
Rep. Cazayoux, Donald J., Jr. [D-LA-6] 09/17/2008

Show cosponsors who withdrew