Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 03/26/2007
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 03/26/2007
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 03/29/2007
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 04/23/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/24/2007
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 05/01/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 05/03/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/23/2007