There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Bureau of Reclamation Site Security Costs Act of 2007

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Titles as Amended by House

A bill to authorize the Secretary of the Interior to seek limited reimbursement for site security activities, and for other purposes.

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Reclamation Safety of Dams Act of 1978 to authorize improvements for the security of dams and other facilities.


Actions Overview (4)

Date Actions Overview
04/10/2008Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Bingaman without amendment. With written report No. 110-323.
12/04/2007Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H14096-14097)
12/04/2007Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 110-459.
03/23/2007Introduced in House

All Actions (20)

Date Chamber All Actions
06/11/2008SenateIndefinitely postponed by Senate by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5530)
04/10/2008SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 675.
04/10/2008SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Bingaman without amendment. With written report No. 110-323.
01/30/2008SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
12/05/2007SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
12/04/2007-2:49pmHouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
12/04/2007-2:49pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/04/2007-2:49pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H14096-14097)
12/04/2007-2:46pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1662.
12/04/2007-2:46pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H14096-14097)
12/04/2007-2:45pmHouseMrs. Napolitano moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
12/04/2007HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 283.
12/04/2007HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 110-459.
11/07/2007HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
11/07/2007HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
04/19/2007HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Unanimous Consent .
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water and Power
04/19/2007HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water and Power
04/03/2007HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Water and Power.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
03/23/2007HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
03/23/2007HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (9)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Natural Resources03/23/2007 Referred to
11/07/2007 Markup by
12/04/2007 Reported by H. Rept. 110-459
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water and Power04/03/2007 Referred to
04/19/2007 Markup by
04/19/2007 Reported by
Senate Energy and Natural Resources12/05/2007 Referred to
01/30/2008 Markup by
04/10/2008 Reported by S. Rept. 110-323

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.1662. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (12/04/2007)

Bureau of Reclamation Site Security Costs Act of 2007 - Makes costs incurred by the Secretary of the Interior for the physical fortification of Bureau of Reclamation facilities to satisfy increased post-September 11, 2001, security needs non-reimbursable.

Directs the Secretary of the Interior to include up to a specified amount of costs incurred for increased levels of guards and patrols, training, patrols by local and tribal law enforcement entities, operation, maintenance, and replacement of guard and response force equipment, and operation and maintenance of facility fortifications at Bureau facilities after September 11, 2001, as reimbursable operation and maintenance costs under reclamation law. Requires site security costs allocated to irrigation and municipal and industrial water service under this Act for the Central Valley Project, California, to be collected by the Secretary exclusively by including such costs in operation and maintenance water rates.

Authorizes the Secretary to develop policies and procedures with project beneficiaries to provide for the payment of reimbursable costs described in this Act.

Directs the Secretary: (1) upon identifying a Bureau facility for a site security measure, to provide to the project beneficiaries written notice describing the need for and the process for identifying and implementing the measure and summarizing related administrative and legal requirements; (2) to provide project beneficiaries an opportunity to consult with the Bureau on the planning, design, and construction of the measure; (3) before incurring security-related costs, to consider cost containment measures recommended by a project beneficiary; (4) to provide to the project beneficiary a timely written response describing any proposed actions to address the recommendations and notice regarding the costs and status of such activities; and (5) to report annually to specified congressional committees on site security actions and activities undertaken pursuant to this Act, including a summary of expenditures and information relating to a five-year planning horizon showing pre- and post-September 11, 2001, costs for site security activities.

Provides that reclamation project security costs at the levels of activity that existed prior to September 11, 2001, shall remain reimbursable.