Committees: H.R.1662 — 110th Congress (2007-2008)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Natural Resources03/23/2007 Referred to
11/07/2007 Markup by
12/04/2007 Reported by H. Rept. 110-459
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water and Power04/03/2007 Referred to
04/19/2007 Markup by
04/19/2007 Reported by
Senate Energy and Natural Resources12/05/2007 Referred to
01/30/2008 Markup by
04/10/2008 Reported by S. Rept. 110-323