Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/29/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 04/17/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/07/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/21/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 10/01/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 10/04/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 10/04/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 10/29/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 01/22/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/01/2008
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 04/08/2008
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 04/08/2008
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 04/17/2008
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 04/30/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/11/2008