Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 03/23/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 03/23/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 03/23/2007
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 03/23/2007
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25]* 03/23/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 03/23/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/23/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 03/23/2007
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 03/23/2007
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 03/23/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 03/23/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/23/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 03/23/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 03/23/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 03/23/2007
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 03/23/2007
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22]* 03/23/2007
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 03/23/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 03/23/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 03/27/2007
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 04/16/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 04/16/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 06/06/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/06/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/06/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/06/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/15/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/20/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/20/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 06/20/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/20/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/20/2007
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/20/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 06/20/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/20/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/20/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 06/20/2007
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 06/20/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 06/20/2007
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 06/20/2007
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 06/20/2007
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 06/20/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/20/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/21/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/21/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 06/22/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/22/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 06/22/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/22/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/26/2007
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 06/26/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/26/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 06/27/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/10/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 07/10/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/10/2007
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 07/11/2007
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 07/12/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/13/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 07/17/2007
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 07/25/2007
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 07/25/2007
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 07/26/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/30/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 08/03/2007
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/07/2007
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 09/07/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/07/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/07/2007
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 09/07/2007
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 09/14/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 09/14/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 09/18/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 09/24/2007
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 09/24/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 09/25/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/26/2007
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 09/26/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 09/27/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 10/02/2007
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 10/02/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 10/03/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 10/22/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 12/04/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 12/06/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 12/11/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 12/18/2007
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 12/18/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 12/18/2007
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 12/18/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 12/18/2007
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 12/19/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 12/19/2007
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 01/15/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/01/2008
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 05/01/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 06/25/2008
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/26/2008
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 07/08/2008
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 07/09/2008
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/09/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/15/2008
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 07/16/2008
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/16/2008
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/16/2008
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 07/16/2008
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/16/2008
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 07/16/2008
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 07/17/2008
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 07/17/2008
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 07/22/2008
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 07/22/2008
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 07/22/2008
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 07/31/2008
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 07/31/2008
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 08/01/2008
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 09/09/2008
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 09/09/2008
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/09/2008
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 09/18/2008
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 09/18/2008
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 09/25/2008
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 09/25/2008