Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 03/23/2007
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 03/23/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 03/23/2007
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 03/23/2007
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 03/23/2007
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14]* 03/23/2007
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 03/23/2007
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 03/23/2007
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 03/23/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 03/23/2007
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 03/23/2007
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4]* 03/23/2007
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 03/23/2007
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16]* 03/23/2007
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 03/23/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 03/23/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 03/23/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 03/23/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 03/23/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 03/23/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 03/23/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 03/23/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 03/23/2007
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 03/23/2007
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 03/23/2007
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 03/23/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 03/23/2007
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11]* 03/23/2007
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4]* 03/23/2007
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 03/23/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 03/23/2007
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 03/23/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 03/23/2007
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 03/23/2007
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 03/23/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 03/23/2007
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 03/23/2007
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10]* 03/23/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29]* 03/23/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2]* 03/23/2007
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 03/23/2007
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 03/23/2007
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 03/23/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 03/23/2007
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 03/23/2007
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 03/23/2007
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 03/23/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 03/23/2007
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21]* 03/23/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 03/23/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 03/23/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 03/23/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 03/23/2007
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 03/23/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/23/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 03/23/2007
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8]* 03/23/2007
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 03/23/2007
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 03/23/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 03/28/2007
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 03/28/2007
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 03/28/2007
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 03/28/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 03/28/2007
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 04/17/2007
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 04/17/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 04/17/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 04/17/2007
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 04/17/2007
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 04/17/2007
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 04/17/2007
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 04/25/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 04/25/2007
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 04/25/2007
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 05/07/2007
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 05/10/2007
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1] 05/14/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/15/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/16/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 05/16/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/05/2007
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 06/11/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/14/2007
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 07/12/2007
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 08/03/2007
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 12/06/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 12/06/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 12/06/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 12/06/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 12/06/2007
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 12/06/2007
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 12/06/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 12/06/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 12/06/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 12/12/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 12/12/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 12/12/2007
Rep. Mahoney, Tim [D-FL-16] 12/12/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 12/12/2007
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 12/12/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 12/18/2007
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 12/18/2007
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 12/18/2007
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 01/17/2008
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 01/17/2008
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/22/2008
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 06/17/2008
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 07/09/2008
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 07/31/2008
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 09/08/2008