Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 03/26/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 03/26/2007
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 03/26/2007
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 03/26/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 03/26/2007
Rep. Mahoney, Tim [D-FL-16]* 03/26/2007
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 03/26/2007
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 03/26/2007
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 03/26/2007
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 03/26/2007
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 03/26/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/16/2007
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 06/12/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 06/12/2007
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 07/27/2007
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/04/2007