Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/28/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 03/28/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 03/29/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/17/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 04/17/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 04/17/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/17/2007
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 04/17/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 04/26/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 04/26/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 04/26/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/03/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/03/2007
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 05/03/2007
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/08/2007
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 05/08/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/08/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/10/2007
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 05/10/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/10/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/15/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 05/15/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/15/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 05/15/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 05/15/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 05/15/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/16/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/16/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 05/16/2007
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 05/16/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 05/16/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/16/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/16/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 05/16/2007
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 05/16/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/16/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 05/16/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 05/16/2007
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 05/16/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 05/16/2007
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 05/16/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/16/2007
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 05/16/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/16/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 05/16/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/16/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/22/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/22/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/24/2007
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 05/24/2007
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 05/24/2007
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 05/24/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 06/05/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 06/05/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/05/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 06/12/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/12/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/18/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/11/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 07/11/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/11/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/27/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/01/2008
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 05/07/2008
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/31/2008