Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 01/22/2007
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 01/22/2007
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 01/22/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 01/22/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 01/22/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 01/22/2007
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 01/29/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 02/12/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/12/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/24/2007
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 06/12/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/03/2008
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 06/11/2008