Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 03/26/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/05/2007
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/05/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 06/05/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/05/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 06/05/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/15/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/28/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/28/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/28/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/27/2007