Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1]* 01/04/2007
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 01/05/2007
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 01/05/2007
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 01/05/2007
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 01/05/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 01/12/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 01/12/2007
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 01/12/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 01/12/2007
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 01/12/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 01/12/2007
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 01/12/2007
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 01/12/2007
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 01/12/2007
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 01/12/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 01/12/2007
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 01/12/2007
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 01/12/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 01/12/2007
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 01/12/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 01/12/2007
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 01/12/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 01/12/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 01/12/2007
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 01/12/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 01/12/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 01/12/2007
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 01/12/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 01/19/2007
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 01/19/2007
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 01/19/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 01/19/2007
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 01/19/2007
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 01/19/2007
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 01/19/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 01/19/2007
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 01/19/2007
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 01/19/2007
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 01/19/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 01/19/2007
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 01/19/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 01/19/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 01/24/2007
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 01/24/2007
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 01/24/2007
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 01/24/2007
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 01/24/2007
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 01/24/2007
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 01/24/2007
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 01/24/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 01/24/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 01/24/2007
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 01/24/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 01/24/2007
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 01/24/2007
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 01/24/2007
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 01/24/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 01/24/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 01/31/2007
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 01/31/2007
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 01/31/2007
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 01/31/2007
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 01/31/2007
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 01/31/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 01/31/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 01/31/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 01/31/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 01/31/2007
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 01/31/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 01/31/2007
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 01/31/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 01/31/2007
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 01/31/2007
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 01/31/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 01/31/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 01/31/2007
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 02/08/2007
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 02/08/2007
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 02/08/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 02/08/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 02/08/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 02/08/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 02/08/2007
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 02/08/2007
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 02/08/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 02/08/2007
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 02/16/2007
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 03/12/2007
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 03/12/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 03/12/2007
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 03/28/2007
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 03/28/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 04/18/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 04/18/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 04/18/2007
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 04/18/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 04/18/2007
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 05/14/2007
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 05/14/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/18/2007
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 09/18/2007
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 09/25/2007
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 09/25/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 10/17/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 10/31/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 11/13/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 11/13/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 11/13/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 11/13/2007
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 12/12/2007
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 12/12/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 12/12/2007
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/10/2008