Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 03/26/2007
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8]* 03/26/2007
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 04/17/2007
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 04/18/2007
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 04/18/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 04/18/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/18/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/18/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 04/18/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 04/18/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 04/18/2007
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 04/18/2007
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 04/18/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 04/19/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 04/19/2007
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 04/19/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 04/19/2007
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 04/19/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/19/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 04/19/2007
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 04/19/2007
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 04/19/2007
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 04/19/2007
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 04/19/2007
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 04/19/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 04/19/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 04/19/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/23/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 04/23/2007
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 04/23/2007
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 04/23/2007
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 04/23/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 04/23/2007
Rep. Mahoney, Tim [D-FL-16] 04/24/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 04/24/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/24/2007
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 04/24/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/24/2007
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 04/24/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/01/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/01/2007
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 05/01/2007
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/01/2007
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 05/01/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 05/01/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 05/01/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 05/01/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/01/2007
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 05/01/2007
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 05/01/2007
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 05/01/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 05/01/2007
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 05/01/2007
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22] 05/01/2007
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 05/01/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/01/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 05/01/2007
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 05/01/2007
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 05/01/2007
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 05/02/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 05/02/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/02/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 05/02/2007
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 05/02/2007
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 05/02/2007
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 05/03/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 05/03/2007
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 05/03/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/03/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 05/07/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/07/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 05/07/2007
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 05/07/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 05/07/2007
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 05/07/2007
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 05/07/2007
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 05/07/2007
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/07/2007
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 05/07/2007
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 05/07/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/07/2007
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/07/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/07/2007
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 05/07/2007
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 05/07/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 05/08/2007
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/08/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/08/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/08/2007
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 05/09/2007
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 05/09/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 05/09/2007
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 05/10/2007
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 05/14/2007
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 05/14/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/14/2007
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20] 05/14/2007
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 05/14/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/14/2007
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 05/14/2007
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 05/14/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/14/2007