There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Common Sense Budget Act of 2007

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To reallocate funds toward sensible priorities such as improved children's education, increased children's access to health care, expanded job training, and increased energy efficiency and conservation through a reduction of wasteful defense spending, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/26/2007Introduced in House

All Actions (13)

Date
07/09/2007Referred to the Subcommittee on Higher Education, Lifelong Learning, and Competitiveness.
Action By: Committee on Education and Labor
06/27/2007Referred to the Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education.
Action By: Committee on Education and Labor
04/20/2007Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
03/27/2007Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Air Quality.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
03/27/2007Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
03/26/2007Referred to House Veterans' Affairs
Action By: House of Representatives
03/26/2007Referred to House Foreign Affairs
Action By: House of Representatives
03/26/2007Referred to House Homeland Security
Action By: House of Representatives
03/26/2007Referred to House Education and Labor
Action By: House of Representatives
03/26/2007Referred to House Energy and Commerce
Action By: House of Representatives
03/26/2007Referred to House Armed Services
Action By: House of Representatives
03/26/2007Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Education and Labor, Homeland Security, Foreign Affairs, and Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/26/2007Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (44)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 03/26/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 03/26/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/26/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 03/26/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/26/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 03/26/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 03/26/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 03/26/2007
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31]* 03/26/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 03/26/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 03/26/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 03/26/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 03/26/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 03/26/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 03/26/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 03/26/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 03/26/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 03/26/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/26/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 03/26/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 03/26/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 03/26/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/19/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 04/19/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 04/23/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/23/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/23/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/01/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 05/03/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 05/03/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/03/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 05/03/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/03/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/03/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 05/03/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/03/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/03/2007
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/03/2007
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 05/03/2007
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 05/03/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 05/03/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 05/03/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/03/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/09/2007

Committees (6)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Armed Services03/26/2007 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce03/26/2007 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health03/27/2007 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Energy and Air Quality03/27/2007 Referred to
House Education and Labor03/26/2007 Referred to
House Education and Labor Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education06/27/2007 Referred to
House Education and Labor Subcommittee on Higher Education, Lifelong Learning, and Competitiveness07/09/2007 Referred to
House Homeland Security03/26/2007 Referred to
House Foreign Affairs03/26/2007 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs03/26/2007 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity04/20/2007 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.1702.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1702. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/26/2007)

Common Sense Budget Act of 2007 - Requires certain reductions in amounts appropriated for FY2008 for specified Department of Defense (DOD) and Department of Energy (DOE) programs. Makes amounts from such reductions available for: (1) modernization of school facilities; (2) the State Children's Health Insurance Program (SCHIP) under title XXI of the Social Security Act; (3) adult and dislocated worker employment and training activities; (4) programs to increase energy efficiency and conservation and increase investment in sustainable and renewable energy alternatives; (5) sustainable development and humanitarian assistance programs to alleviate global poverty, illiteracy, unemployment, disease, and disaster; (6) homeland security safeguard improvements; (7) deficit reduction; and (8) veterans health care.