Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 03/26/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 03/26/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/26/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 03/26/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/26/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 03/26/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 03/26/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 03/26/2007
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31]* 03/26/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 03/26/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 03/26/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 03/26/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 03/26/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 03/26/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 03/26/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 03/26/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 03/26/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 03/26/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/26/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 03/26/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 03/26/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 03/26/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/19/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 04/19/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 04/23/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/23/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/23/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/01/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 05/03/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 05/03/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/03/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 05/03/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/03/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/03/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 05/03/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/03/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/03/2007
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/03/2007
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 05/03/2007
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 05/03/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 05/03/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 05/03/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/03/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/09/2007