Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 03/27/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 03/27/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 03/27/2007
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 03/27/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 03/27/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 03/27/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 03/27/2007
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 03/27/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 03/27/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 03/27/2007
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8]* 03/27/2007
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 03/27/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 03/27/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 03/27/2007
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19]* 03/27/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 03/27/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 03/27/2007
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9]* 03/27/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 03/27/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 03/27/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 03/27/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29]* 03/27/2007
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22]* 03/27/2007
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 03/27/2007
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 03/27/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 03/27/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 03/27/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 03/27/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 03/27/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 03/27/2007
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 03/27/2007
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11]* 03/27/2007
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 03/27/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 03/27/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 03/27/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 03/27/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/29/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/29/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 03/29/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/29/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/17/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 04/17/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 04/17/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 04/17/2007
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 04/17/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/17/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 04/17/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/17/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 04/17/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 04/17/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 04/23/2007
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 04/23/2007
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 04/23/2007
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 05/07/2007
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 05/07/2007
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 05/07/2007
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 05/07/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/07/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 05/07/2007
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 05/07/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/07/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/07/2007
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 05/07/2007
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 05/14/2007
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 05/14/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/15/2007
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/15/2007
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 05/15/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/24/2007
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 05/24/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/24/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 06/05/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/05/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/11/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/11/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 06/11/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/11/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/11/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 06/15/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 06/15/2007
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 06/20/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 06/20/2007
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 06/28/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/28/2007