Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/17/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/17/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/17/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 04/17/2007
Rep. Mahoney, Tim [D-FL-16] 04/17/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 04/19/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/19/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/20/2007
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 04/20/2007
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 04/24/2007
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 04/24/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 04/25/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/01/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 05/01/2007
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 05/01/2007
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20] 05/02/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 05/07/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 05/08/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 05/09/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 05/14/2007
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 05/14/2007
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 05/16/2007
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 05/21/2007
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/21/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/21/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/22/2007
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 05/22/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 05/24/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/05/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 06/05/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 06/05/2007
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 06/11/2007
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 06/13/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/13/2007
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 06/13/2007
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 06/13/2007
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 06/18/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/18/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/18/2007
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 06/21/2007
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 06/28/2007
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 06/28/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 07/12/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/12/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 07/12/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/12/2007
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/12/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 07/17/2007
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 07/23/2007
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 07/26/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 02/27/2008
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 06/26/2008