Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 01/04/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 01/04/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 01/05/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 01/09/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 01/09/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 01/16/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/05/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 03/05/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/05/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 03/05/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/05/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/07/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 03/07/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 03/07/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/07/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 03/07/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/08/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/09/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 03/09/2007
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 03/14/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/14/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 03/28/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/28/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/29/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 04/16/2007
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 04/16/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/23/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/01/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/01/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 05/10/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/16/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/21/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/24/2007
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 06/05/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 06/20/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/17/2007
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 09/17/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/27/2007
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 11/15/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 01/15/2008
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 01/15/2008