Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 03/27/2007
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 03/27/2007
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 03/27/2007
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 03/27/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/27/2007
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 03/28/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 04/20/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 04/20/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/20/2007
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 04/20/2007
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 04/20/2007
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 05/08/2007
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 05/10/2007
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 06/06/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 06/06/2007
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 08/01/2007
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 09/07/2007