Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 03/27/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 03/27/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 03/27/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 03/27/2007
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 03/27/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 03/27/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 03/27/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 03/28/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 03/28/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/24/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/24/2007
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 05/09/2007
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 06/12/2007
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 06/12/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 06/19/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 06/25/2007