Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 01/23/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 01/23/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 01/24/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 01/24/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 01/29/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 01/30/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/19/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/05/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/05/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/05/2007