Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 03/28/2007
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 03/28/2007
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9]* 03/28/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/18/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/18/2007
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 04/18/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 04/18/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 04/18/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/18/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 04/18/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/18/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 04/18/2007
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/18/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 04/18/2007
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 04/18/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 05/01/2007
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 05/01/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/01/2007
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 05/01/2007
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 05/01/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 05/01/2007
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 05/01/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/01/2007
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/01/2007
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 05/01/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/03/2007
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 05/03/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/03/2007
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 05/03/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/03/2007
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 05/08/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/08/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 05/08/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/08/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 05/08/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 05/24/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/24/2007
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 05/24/2007
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22] 05/24/2007
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 06/06/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/06/2007
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/06/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/06/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/06/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 06/06/2007
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 06/06/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/06/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/06/2007
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 06/14/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 06/14/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/14/2007
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 06/14/2007
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 06/14/2007
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 06/14/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/14/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/26/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/26/2007
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 06/26/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 07/12/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 07/12/2007
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 07/12/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 08/01/2007
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 08/01/2007
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 08/01/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/26/2007
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 09/26/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/27/2007
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 10/10/2007