Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 03/28/2007
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 03/28/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 03/28/2007
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 03/28/2007
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 03/28/2007
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17]* 03/28/2007
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 03/28/2007
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large]* 03/28/2007
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 03/28/2007
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 03/28/2007
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 03/28/2007
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 03/28/2007
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 03/28/2007
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 03/28/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 03/28/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 03/28/2007
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 03/28/2007
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 03/28/2007
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 03/28/2007
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 03/28/2007
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 03/28/2007
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 03/28/2007
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 03/28/2007
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large]* 03/28/2007
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3]* 03/28/2007
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 03/28/2007
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 03/28/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 03/28/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 03/28/2007
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1]* 03/28/2007
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 03/28/2007
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 03/28/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2]* 03/28/2007
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 03/28/2007
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 03/28/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 03/28/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 03/28/2007
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 03/28/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 03/28/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 03/28/2007
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4]* 03/28/2007
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2]* 03/28/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 03/28/2007
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 03/28/2007
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 03/29/2007
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 03/29/2007
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 03/29/2007
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/17/2007
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 04/17/2007
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 04/17/2007
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 04/17/2007
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 04/18/2007
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 04/25/2007
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 05/02/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/09/2007
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 06/13/2007
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 09/04/2007
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 03/10/2008