Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 03/28/2007
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 04/16/2007
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 04/16/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 04/16/2007
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 04/16/2007
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 04/16/2007
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 04/16/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 04/16/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 04/16/2007
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 04/16/2007
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 04/16/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/16/2007
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 04/16/2007
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 04/16/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 04/16/2007
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 04/16/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 04/16/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/16/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 04/16/2007
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 04/16/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/16/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 04/16/2007
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 04/16/2007
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 04/16/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 04/16/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/16/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 04/18/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 04/18/2007
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 04/18/2007
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 04/18/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 04/25/2007
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 04/25/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 04/25/2007
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 04/25/2007
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 04/25/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/25/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 04/25/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 05/01/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/01/2007
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 05/01/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/01/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 05/09/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/23/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/24/2007
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 06/15/2007
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 07/27/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 02/06/2008