Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 03/28/2007
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 03/28/2007
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 03/28/2007
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 03/28/2007
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 03/28/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 03/28/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 03/28/2007
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1]* 03/28/2007
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 04/16/2007
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 04/16/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/17/2007
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 04/18/2007
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 04/18/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 04/30/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/01/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/10/2007
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/14/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 05/15/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/23/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 06/07/2007
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 06/11/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/21/2007
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 06/22/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/25/2007
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 07/16/2007
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 07/18/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 09/05/2007
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 09/14/2007
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 09/14/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 10/30/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 02/14/2008
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 02/26/2008
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 02/26/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/03/2008
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 06/10/2008
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/19/2008