Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 03/28/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 04/16/2007
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 04/20/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 04/20/2007
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 04/20/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/20/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 04/20/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 04/20/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/20/2007
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 04/24/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 04/24/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 04/24/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 04/24/2007
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 04/24/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/02/2007
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 05/02/2007
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/02/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 05/02/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/02/2007
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 05/02/2007
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 05/02/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/03/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/03/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 05/08/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/08/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/09/2007
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 05/09/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 05/09/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 05/17/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 05/23/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/23/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 05/23/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/23/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/23/2007
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 05/24/2007
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 05/24/2007
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 06/06/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/13/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/13/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/15/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/15/2007
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 06/15/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/21/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 06/21/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/25/2007
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 07/18/2007
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 07/18/2007
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 09/04/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/04/2007
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 09/04/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 09/04/2007
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 09/04/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 09/07/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/17/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/17/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 09/17/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 09/17/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/19/2007
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 09/19/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 09/20/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/25/2007
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 09/25/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 09/25/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 09/26/2007
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 09/26/2007
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 09/26/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/26/2007
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 09/26/2007
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 09/27/2007
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 09/27/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 10/01/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 10/01/2007
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 10/01/2007
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 10/02/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 10/03/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 10/09/2007
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 10/10/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 10/10/2007
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 10/15/2007
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 10/15/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 10/15/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 10/15/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 10/15/2007
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 10/15/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 10/15/2007
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 10/15/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 10/15/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 10/16/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 10/16/2007
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 10/17/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 10/17/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 10/29/2007
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 10/29/2007
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 10/29/2007
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 10/29/2007
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 10/29/2007
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 10/29/2007
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 10/30/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 10/31/2007
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 11/06/2007
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 11/13/2007
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 11/14/2007
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 11/15/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 11/15/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 11/15/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 12/11/2007
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 12/11/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 12/11/2007
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 12/19/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 12/19/2007
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 12/19/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 01/15/2008
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 01/29/2008
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 02/25/2008
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/06/2008
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/10/2008
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 03/11/2008
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 03/31/2008
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/31/2008
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/02/2008
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 04/08/2008
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 04/10/2008
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 04/14/2008
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 04/17/2008
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 04/17/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/24/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/29/2008
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/29/2008
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/08/2008
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 05/14/2008
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 05/14/2008
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 05/14/2008
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 05/14/2008
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 05/15/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/15/2008
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 05/19/2008
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 05/21/2008
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 06/05/2008
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 06/05/2008
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 06/10/2008
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/19/2008
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 06/20/2008
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 06/20/2008
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 06/25/2008
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 06/25/2008
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/25/2008
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 07/08/2008
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/08/2008
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 07/23/2008
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 07/30/2008
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 09/08/2008
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/08/2008
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 09/11/2008
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/11/2008
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 09/16/2008
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/16/2008
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 09/17/2008
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 09/24/2008
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 09/24/2008
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 09/24/2008
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 10/03/2008