Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 03/28/2007
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 03/28/2007
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 03/28/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 04/17/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/17/2007
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 04/17/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 04/17/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/17/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/17/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 04/17/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/17/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/17/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 04/26/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/26/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 04/26/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 04/26/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 04/26/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 04/26/2007
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 04/26/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/26/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/26/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/08/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/08/2007
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/08/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/08/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 05/08/2007
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 05/09/2007
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 05/10/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/14/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/14/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/16/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/22/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/22/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/16/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 07/16/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 08/03/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/10/2007
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 10/17/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 11/07/2007
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 11/15/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 12/19/2007