Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 03/28/2007
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 03/28/2007
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 03/28/2007
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 03/28/2007
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 05/01/2007
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 05/01/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/01/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 05/01/2007
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/01/2007
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 05/21/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 05/21/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/05/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/05/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/20/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 06/20/2007
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 07/24/2007
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/24/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 08/01/2007
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 08/01/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 08/01/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 08/03/2007
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 09/17/2007
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 09/17/2007
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 09/17/2007
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 09/17/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/17/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/17/2007
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 10/15/2007
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 10/15/2007
Rep. Mahoney, Tim [D-FL-16] 10/15/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 10/15/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 10/15/2007
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 10/22/2007
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 10/23/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 11/06/2007
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 11/06/2007
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 11/06/2007
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 12/04/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 12/04/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 12/18/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 02/07/2008
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 04/22/2008
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/13/2008
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 07/14/2008