Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11]* 03/28/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 03/28/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 03/28/2007
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 03/28/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 03/28/2007
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 03/28/2007
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 03/28/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 03/28/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 03/28/2007
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 03/28/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 03/28/2007
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 03/28/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/28/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/29/2007
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 03/29/2007
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 04/17/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 04/17/2007
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 04/19/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 05/01/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/02/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/03/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/03/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 05/03/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/03/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/09/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 05/09/2007
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 05/09/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/09/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 05/09/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/09/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/09/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 05/09/2007
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 05/10/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/16/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/16/2007
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 05/17/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 05/23/2007
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/15/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 10/04/2007
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 10/16/2007
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 10/16/2007
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 10/18/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 12/12/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 12/12/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 12/12/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 12/13/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 12/13/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 12/18/2007
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 01/22/2008