Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Mahoney, Tim [D-FL-16]* 03/29/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 05/09/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 05/09/2007
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 05/09/2007
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 05/09/2007
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 05/09/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/09/2007
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 05/09/2007
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 05/09/2007
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 05/10/2007
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 05/16/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 05/16/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 05/16/2007
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 05/16/2007
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 05/16/2007
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 05/16/2007
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 05/16/2007
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/16/2007
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20] 05/16/2007
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 05/16/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 05/17/2007
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 05/17/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 05/17/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 05/17/2007
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/17/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 05/17/2007
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 05/17/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 05/17/2007
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 05/17/2007
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 05/17/2007
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 05/17/2007
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 05/21/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/21/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/21/2007
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 05/24/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/24/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 05/24/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 06/07/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 06/07/2007
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 06/07/2007
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 06/07/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/07/2007
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 06/07/2007
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 06/07/2007
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 06/18/2007
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 06/18/2007
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 06/18/2007
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22] 06/19/2007
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 06/21/2007
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 06/21/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/18/2007