Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 03/29/2007
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 04/16/2007
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 04/16/2007
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 04/16/2007
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 04/16/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 04/16/2007
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 04/16/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 04/16/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 04/16/2007
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 04/17/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 04/17/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 04/17/2007
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 04/17/2007
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 04/17/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 04/19/2007
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 04/19/2007
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 04/19/2007
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 04/19/2007
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 04/19/2007
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 04/23/2007
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 04/23/2007
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 04/23/2007
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 04/23/2007
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 04/25/2007
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 04/25/2007
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 05/01/2007
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 05/01/2007
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 05/02/2007
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 05/02/2007
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 05/07/2007
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 05/07/2007
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/08/2007
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 05/15/2007
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 05/15/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 07/18/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 09/17/2007
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 09/17/2007

Show cosponsors who withdrew