Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 03/29/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 05/08/2007
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 05/16/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 05/16/2007
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 05/16/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 05/16/2007
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 05/16/2007
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 05/16/2007
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 05/16/2007
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 05/16/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/16/2007
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 05/16/2007
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 05/16/2007
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 05/16/2007
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 05/16/2007
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 05/16/2007
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 05/16/2007
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 05/16/2007
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 05/21/2007
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 05/21/2007
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 05/21/2007
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 05/21/2007
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 05/21/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/21/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 05/21/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/21/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 05/21/2007
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 05/21/2007
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 05/21/2007
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 05/21/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 05/23/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/24/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 06/05/2007
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 06/05/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/05/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 06/13/2007
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 06/13/2007
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 06/20/2007
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 06/20/2007
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 06/20/2007
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 06/20/2007
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 06/20/2007
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 06/20/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 06/20/2007
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 06/20/2007
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 06/20/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 06/21/2007
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 06/21/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/21/2007
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 06/26/2007
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 06/27/2007
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 06/27/2007