Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 04/16/2007
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 04/17/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 04/24/2007
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 05/07/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 07/18/2007
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 09/04/2007
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 10/17/2007