Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 04/19/2007
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 04/19/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/19/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/19/2007
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 04/19/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 04/19/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 04/19/2007
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 04/19/2007
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 04/19/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/19/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 04/19/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 04/19/2007
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 04/19/2007
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 04/19/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/19/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 04/25/2007
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 04/25/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 04/25/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 04/25/2007
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 04/25/2007
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 04/25/2007
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 05/01/2007
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 05/01/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 05/01/2007
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 05/01/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/01/2007
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/08/2007
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 05/08/2007
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 05/08/2007
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 05/08/2007
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/14/2007
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 06/14/2007
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 06/14/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 06/14/2007
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 06/14/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 06/15/2007
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 06/21/2007
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 06/27/2007
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 06/27/2007
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 07/11/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 07/12/2007
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 07/30/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/30/2007
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 07/30/2007
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 08/01/2007
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 08/02/2007
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 08/03/2007
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 08/03/2007
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 09/07/2007
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 09/07/2007
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 09/07/2007
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 09/18/2007
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 09/18/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 10/10/2007
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 10/12/2007
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 10/15/2007
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 10/25/2007
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 12/06/2007
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 02/13/2008
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 02/13/2008
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 02/14/2008
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 02/14/2008
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 02/14/2008
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 02/19/2008
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 02/28/2008
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 02/28/2008
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 02/28/2008
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 02/28/2008
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 02/28/2008
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 02/28/2008
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 02/28/2008
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 03/04/2008
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 03/04/2008
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 03/04/2008
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 03/06/2008
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 03/06/2008
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 03/06/2008
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 03/13/2008
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 04/08/2008
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 04/08/2008
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 04/10/2008
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 04/10/2008
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/06/2008
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 05/06/2008
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 05/06/2008
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 05/20/2008
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 06/25/2008
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 07/10/2008
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 07/10/2008
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 07/15/2008
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 09/16/2008
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22] 09/16/2008
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 09/16/2008
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 09/17/2008
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 09/29/2008