Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/23/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 04/23/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/23/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 05/01/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/01/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/08/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 05/15/2007
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 05/15/2007
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 05/15/2007
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 05/15/2007
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 05/15/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/17/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 05/21/2007
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 05/21/2007
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/21/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 05/21/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 05/24/2007
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 05/24/2007
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 06/06/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/06/2007
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 06/11/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/11/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 06/15/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/12/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 12/11/2007
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 04/08/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/08/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 04/08/2008
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 04/15/2008
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 04/15/2008
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 04/15/2008
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/22/2008
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 04/22/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/29/2008
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 04/29/2008
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 04/29/2008
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 04/29/2008
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 05/05/2008
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 05/05/2008
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 05/05/2008
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 05/22/2008
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 05/22/2008
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/12/2008
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/09/2008
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 07/09/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/17/2008
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 09/08/2008
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 09/11/2008