Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 03/29/2007
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 04/19/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 04/19/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 04/19/2007
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 05/01/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/01/2007
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 05/01/2007
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 05/02/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 05/02/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/02/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/02/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/02/2007
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/02/2007
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 05/02/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/07/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/07/2007
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/07/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 05/07/2007
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/07/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/07/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/07/2007
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/09/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 05/09/2007
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 05/09/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/09/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/09/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/09/2007
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 05/10/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/10/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/10/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/10/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/10/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 05/10/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/10/2007
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 05/17/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/17/2007
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 05/17/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 05/17/2007
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 05/17/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/17/2007
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 05/17/2007
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 05/17/2007
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 05/17/2007
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 05/24/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 05/24/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 05/24/2007
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 05/24/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 06/07/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 06/07/2007
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 06/07/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/07/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/07/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/26/2007
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22] 06/26/2007
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 07/19/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 07/19/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/19/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/19/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/19/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 07/19/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/19/2007
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 07/19/2007
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 08/02/2007
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 08/02/2007
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 08/02/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 11/01/2007
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 11/01/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 11/01/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 11/01/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 03/13/2008
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 04/09/2008
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/24/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/30/2008
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/20/2008
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 05/20/2008
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 05/20/2008
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/20/2008
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/22/2008
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 06/03/2008
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/24/2008
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 09/09/2008