Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 04/24/2007
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 06/22/2007
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 10/22/2007
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 11/09/2007
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 05/15/2008