Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 04/17/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/17/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 04/17/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 04/17/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/17/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 04/17/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/17/2007
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/17/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/17/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/17/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/17/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 04/17/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/17/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 04/17/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 04/17/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/17/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 04/24/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/24/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/02/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/03/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/08/2007
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 05/09/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/21/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/23/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/07/2007
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 06/07/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 06/12/2007
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 06/12/2007
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 06/13/2007
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 07/10/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/10/2007
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 07/19/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 07/23/2007
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 07/27/2007
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 01/29/2008
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 06/04/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/04/2008
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/04/2008
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 06/04/2008
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/17/2008
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 06/17/2008
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 06/17/2008
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/30/2008
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 07/30/2008
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 07/30/2008
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 07/30/2008
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 07/30/2008
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 07/30/2008
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 07/30/2008
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 07/30/2008
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/30/2008
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/30/2008
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/30/2008
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/30/2008
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 07/30/2008
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/30/2008
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/30/2008
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/30/2008
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/30/2008
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 07/30/2008
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 07/30/2008
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 07/30/2008
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 07/30/2008
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 07/30/2008
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 07/30/2008
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/30/2008
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14] 07/30/2008
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 07/30/2008
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 07/30/2008
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 07/30/2008
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 07/30/2008
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 07/30/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/30/2008
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/11/2008
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 09/11/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 09/11/2008
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/11/2008
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 09/11/2008
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 09/17/2008
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 09/17/2008
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 09/23/2008
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/23/2008
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 09/23/2008
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 09/23/2008
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 09/23/2008
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 09/23/2008
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 09/26/2008
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 09/29/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/29/2008
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 11/19/2008
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 11/20/2008