Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 03/29/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/17/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/17/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/17/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/17/2007
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 04/19/2007
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 05/02/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/02/2007
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 05/02/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 05/09/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/09/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/11/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 06/13/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/28/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 07/11/2007
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 07/11/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/11/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 08/01/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 08/01/2007
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 09/07/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 09/07/2007
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 09/24/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/24/2007
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 10/17/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 10/24/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 11/05/2007
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 11/05/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 12/11/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 01/28/2008
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/05/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/19/2008