Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/13/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 06/15/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/15/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/20/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 06/21/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 12/10/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 12/12/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 12/12/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 12/12/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 12/12/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 12/12/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 12/18/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 01/29/2008