There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Menopausal Hormone Replacement Therapies and Alternative Treatments and Fairness Act of 2007

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide for coverage of hormone replacement therapy for treatment of menopausal symptoms, and for coverage of an alternative therapy for hormone replacement therapy for such symptoms, under the Medicare and Medicaid Programs, group health plans and individual health insurance coverage, and other Federal health insurance programs.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
03/29/2007Introduced in House

All Actions (12)

Date All Actions
07/09/2007Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions.
Action By: Committee on Education and Labor
06/21/2007Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health
04/23/2007Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
04/20/2007Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
03/30/2007Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
03/29/2007Referred to House Veterans' Affairs
Action By: House of Representatives
03/29/2007Referred to House Oversight and Government Reform
Action By: House of Representatives
03/29/2007Referred to House Education and Labor
Action By: House of Representatives
03/29/2007Referred to House Ways and Means
Action By: House of Representatives
03/29/2007Referred to House Energy and Commerce
Action By: House of Representatives
03/29/2007Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Education and Labor, Oversight and Government Reform, and Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/29/2007Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (7)


Committees (5)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Energy and Commerce03/29/2007 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health03/30/2007 Referred to
House Ways and Means03/29/2007 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Health04/20/2007 Referred to
House Education and Labor03/29/2007 Referred to
House Education and Labor Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions07/09/2007 Referred to
House Oversight and Government Reform03/29/2007 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs03/29/2007 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health04/23/2007 Referred to
06/21/2007 Hearings by

No related bill information was received for H.R.1812.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1812. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/29/2007)

Menopausal Hormone Replacement Therapies and Alternative Treatments and Fairness Act of 2007 - Amends the Social Security Act to include coverage of hormone replacement therapy for menopausal symptoms and alternative treatments for such therapy under Medicare (title XVIII of the Act). Includes alternative treatments for hormone replacement therapy for menopausal symptoms under Medicaid (title XIX of the Act).

Requires coverage of hormone replacement therapy for menopausal symptoms and alternative treatments for such therapy on the same basis as outpatient prescription drugs under: (1) the Public Health Service Act and the Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974 (group health plans and group and individual health insurance); (2) the Internal Revenue Code (group health plans);and (3) federal employee health benefit plans.

Includes alternative treatments for hormone replacement therapy for menopausal symptoms under veterans' benefits.