Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5]* 03/29/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 04/17/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/02/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/02/2007
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 05/07/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/07/2007
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 05/08/2007
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 05/10/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 05/10/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/10/2007
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/14/2007
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 05/14/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 06/07/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 06/14/2007
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 06/14/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/14/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/25/2007
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 07/11/2007
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 07/11/2007
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 07/19/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/27/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 07/27/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 08/03/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/04/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 09/27/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 09/27/2007
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 10/04/2007
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/24/2008