Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/17/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/02/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/02/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 05/15/2007
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 05/15/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/15/2007
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 05/15/2007
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 05/24/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 09/17/2007
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 10/04/2007
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 10/04/2007
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 10/23/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 10/23/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 12/04/2007
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 12/04/2007
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 02/06/2008
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 02/28/2008
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 02/28/2008
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 02/28/2008
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 02/28/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 02/28/2008
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/28/2008
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/28/2008
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/04/2008
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 03/04/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/04/2008
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/13/2008
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 04/09/2008
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 04/09/2008
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/14/2008
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 04/14/2008
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 04/14/2008
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 04/14/2008
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 04/24/2008
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 04/24/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/30/2008
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 04/30/2008
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/06/2008
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/20/2008
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/10/2008
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/23/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/17/2008
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 07/17/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/24/2008
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/24/2008
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/24/2008
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/24/2008
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 07/24/2008
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 07/24/2008
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 07/31/2008
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/31/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/31/2008
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 07/31/2008
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 09/09/2008
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 09/09/2008
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/09/2008
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/09/2008
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 09/09/2008
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 09/09/2008
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/09/2008
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/09/2008
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/09/2008
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 09/09/2008
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/09/2008
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 09/09/2008
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/09/2008
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 09/09/2008
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/09/2008
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/09/2008
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 09/09/2008
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/09/2008
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 09/09/2008
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 09/09/2008
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 09/09/2008
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 09/09/2008
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 09/09/2008
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/10/2008
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 09/10/2008
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 09/10/2008
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 09/10/2008
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/10/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/10/2008
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 09/10/2008
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 09/10/2008
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/10/2008
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 09/10/2008
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/10/2008
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 09/11/2008
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 09/11/2008
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 09/11/2008
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/11/2008
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 09/11/2008
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 09/11/2008
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/15/2008
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/15/2008
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 09/15/2008
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 09/15/2008
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 09/15/2008
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 09/15/2008
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/17/2008
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 09/17/2008
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 09/17/2008
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 09/17/2008
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/17/2008
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 09/17/2008
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 09/17/2008
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 09/18/2008
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 09/18/2008
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 09/22/2008
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 09/22/2008
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/22/2008
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 09/25/2008
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 09/25/2008
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 09/25/2008
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 09/25/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 09/25/2008
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 09/26/2008
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 09/29/2008
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 10/03/2008