Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 04/16/2007
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 04/17/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/18/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 04/19/2007
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 04/23/2007
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 04/23/2007
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 04/23/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 04/25/2007
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 04/25/2007
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 04/25/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/03/2007
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 05/07/2007
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 05/07/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/07/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 05/09/2007
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 05/09/2007
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/15/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/15/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/21/2007
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 06/06/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 06/13/2007
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 06/13/2007
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 06/13/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 06/13/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/19/2007
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 06/19/2007
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/19/2007
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 06/26/2007
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 07/11/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/11/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 07/11/2007
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 07/11/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 07/24/2007
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 08/03/2007
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22] 09/05/2007
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 09/20/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 09/20/2007
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 10/04/2007
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 10/04/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 10/15/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 11/08/2007
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 12/04/2007
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 02/06/2008
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 02/06/2008
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 02/06/2008
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 03/31/2008
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 03/31/2008
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 08/01/2008