Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 04/17/2007
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 04/17/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 05/03/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 05/03/2007
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 06/27/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/27/2007
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 11/06/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 11/06/2007
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 11/06/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 11/15/2007
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 01/29/2008
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 02/07/2008
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 02/07/2008
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 02/07/2008
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 02/27/2008
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 04/10/2008
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 04/10/2008
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 06/03/2008