Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 03/29/2007
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 04/19/2007
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 05/24/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 06/14/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 10/23/2007