Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 05/03/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/03/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/03/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/03/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 05/21/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/23/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 05/23/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/23/2007
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/07/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/15/2007
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 06/19/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 06/26/2007